ND HB1030 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Energy Development and Transmission Committee) AN ACT to provide that the present use and disposal of coal combustion residues is acceptable in North Dakota.
Title
(Energy Development and Transmission Committee) AN ACT to provide that the present use and disposal of coal combustion residues is acceptable in North Dakota.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2013-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2013-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-01-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |