ND HB1030 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-27-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gubernatorial waivers of required class rescheduling.
Title
Gubernatorial waivers of required class rescheduling.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20 | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by Governor 04/19 | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-04 | Returned to House | |
2011-04-01 | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 | |
2011-03-31 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2011-03-30 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-29 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee | |
2011-01-14 | Received from House | |
2011-01-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 | |
2011-01-12 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 1 | |
2011-01-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |