ND HB1024 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the ethics commission.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the ethics commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 46 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 46 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2021-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2021-04-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 66 nays 27 |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Rust Davison |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Howe Mock Meier |
2021-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 34 nays 13 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 61 nays 33 |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 17 4 0 |
2021-02-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-22 | House | Reconsidered |
2021-02-22 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 46 nays 48 |
2021-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 4 0 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |