ND HB1016 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the adjutant general; to amend and reenact section 37-17.1-14.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the northern emergency management assistance compact; to provide an exemption; to provide a report; to provide legislative intent; to provide for a transfer; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The northern emergency management assistance compact; to provide an exemption; to provide a report; to provide legislative intent; to provide for a transfer; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Rust Hogue |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Brandenburg Kempenich Mock |
2021-04-15 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |