ND HB1012 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of human services; to provide an appropriation to the state department of health; to provide an appropriation to the legislative council; to provide an appropriation to the office of management and budget; to create and enact a new section to chapter 1-02, two new sections to chapter 50-06, and a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to person-first language, substance use disorder treatment voucher system grants, a behavioral health bed management system, and medical assistance coverage of interpreter services; to create and enact a new paragraph to subdivision I of subsection 1 of section 50-11.1-22 of the North Dakota Century Code as created by section 8 of House Bill No. 1416, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, relating to the North Dakota early childhood council membership; to amend and reenact sections 50-06-42, 50-11.1-14, 50-24.1-02.7, 50-24.1-31, and 50-24.1-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the substance use disorder voucher program, early childhood workforce development fees, Medicaid coverage for workers with disability coverage and families of children with disabilities, and the Medicaid expansion program; to repeal section 50-24.1-18.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to consumer-directed health maintenance services; to provide an exemption; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide for a study; to provide for a transfer; to provide for the conveyance of land; to provide an application; to provide for retroactive application; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Consumer-directed health maintenance services; to provide an exemption; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide for a study; to provide for a transfer; to provide for the conveyance of land; to provide an application; to provide for retroactive application; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 05/10 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 10 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 13, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Dever Hogue Mathern |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed J. Nelson Kreidt Mitskog |
2021-04-15 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 34 nays 13 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 21, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 0 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |