ND HB1010 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the council on the arts; to provide for transfers; to provide for a report; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the council on the arts; to provide for transfers; to provide for a report; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 |
2023-05-18 | House | Signed by Governor 05/05 |
2023-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 18, Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Rust Krebsbach Meyer |
2023-04-07 | House | Conference committee appointed Strinden B. Anderson Mitskog |
2023-04-07 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 18 |
2023-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 1 5 |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee Hearing 07:00 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 02:55 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |