ND HB1008 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the public service commission; to create and enact two new sections to chapter 49-01, subsection 4 of section 49-22-22, subsection 4 of section 49-22.1-21, and a new section to chapter 64-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a public service commission program fund, a public utility assessment, siting process administrative fees, and fees for registered service companies and to license and test a registered service person; to amend and reenact sections 49-01-05, 57-43.2-19, 64-02-10, and 64-02-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the commissioners, the transfer and distribution of funds in the highway tax distribution fund, fees to test or calibrate weighing and measuring devices, and the deposit of fees; to provide a report; to provide for a transfer; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The salary of the commissioners, the transfer and distribution of funds in the highway tax distribution fund, fees to test or calibrate weighing and measuring devices, and the deposit of fees; to provide a report; to provide for a transfer; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wanzek Poolman Krebsbach |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Brandenburg Kempenich Mock |
2021-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 10 |
2021-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 2 3 |
2021-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |