ND SCR4007 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the memberships of the Board of University and School Lands and the Industrial Commission.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the memberships of the Board of University and School Lands and the Industrial Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. James Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Government and Veterans Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Request return from committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, adopted yeas 32 nays 14 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |