ND 4005 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging the Legislative Management to study the state's public transportation funding for individuals with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging the Legislative Management to study the state's public transportation funding for individuals with disabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-13SenateSecond reading, failed to adopt
2017-02-10SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-01-12SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback