ND HCR3032 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 23 nays 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 23 nays 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 25 of article XI of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to authorizing sports betting.
Title
Authorizing sports betting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 23 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 22 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 22 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 23 nays 24 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 22 nays 24 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 70 nays 24 |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |