ND HCR3028 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the Sixty-third Legislative Assembly to recognize the month of November 2013 as "Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease Awareness Month" throughout the state in recognition of this deadly disease and its effects on the citizens of North Dakota and encourage all residents of North Dakota to learn more about the prevention and treatment of chronic obstructive pulmonary disease.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the Sixty-third Legislative Assembly to recognize the month of November 2013 as "Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease Awareness Month" throughout the state in recognition of this deadly disease and its effects on the citizens of North Dakota and encourage all residents of North Dakota to learn more about the prevention and treatment of chronic obstructive pulmonary disease.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08 |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-27 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-02-25 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |