ND HCR3028 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to adopt legislation prohibiting the Environmental Protection Agency by any legal means from regulating greenhouse emissions, including, if necessary, defunding Environmental Protection Agency greenhouse gas regulatory activities; imposing a moratorium on adoption on any new air quality regulations by the Environmental Protection Agency by any legal means, except those regulations directly addressing an imminent health or environmental emergency, for a period of at least two years; and requiring the administration to undertake a study identifying all regulatory activity the Environmental Protection Agency intends to undertake in furtherance of its goal of "taking action on climate change and improving air quality" and specifying the cumulative effect of all these regulations on the economy, jobs, and American economic competitiveness.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to adopt legislation prohibiting the Environmental Protection Agency by any legal means from regulating greenhouse emissions, including, if necessary, defunding Environmental Protection Agency greenhouse gas regulatory activities; imposing a moratorium on adoption on any new air quality regulations by the Environmental Protection Agency by any legal means, except those regulations directly addressing an imminent health or environmental emergency, for a period of at least two years; and requiring the administration to undertake a study identifying all regulatory activity the Environmental Protection Agency intends to undertake in furtherance of its goal of "taking action on climate change and improving air quality" and specifying the cumulative effect of all these regulations on the economy, jobs, and American economic competitiveness.
Sponsors
Sen. Randel Christmann [R] | Rep. Bette Grande [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Brenda Heller [R] |
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-28 | Concurred | |
2011-03-25 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-25 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Received from House | |
2011-02-18 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-15 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-28 | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |