ND HCR3013 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 8 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 8 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to create and enact section 26 of article I of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to exercising eminent domain over certain mineral rights and pore space for the benefit of private industry; and to amend and reenact section 16 of article I of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to an exception to the limitations on exercising eminent domain.
Title
An exception to the limitations on exercising eminent domain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 8 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 8 nays 83 |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |