ND 3011 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution extending appreciation to the President of the United States for expediting the approval of the easement required for the completion of the Dakota Access Pipeline, and requesting the federal government reimburse the state of North Dakota for all expenses incurred as a result of the Dakota Access Pipeline protests and permitting delays.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution extending appreciation to the President of the United States for expediting the approval of the easement required for the completion of the Dakota Access Pipeline, and requesting the federal government reimburse the state of North Dakota for all expenses incurred as a result of the Dakota Access Pipeline protests and permitting delays.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 04/07
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 87 nays 5
2017-04-04HouseConcurred
2017-03-23HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-22SenateSecond reading, adopted as amended
2017-03-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 83 nays 6
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback