ND 3007 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 28 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution terminating the state of emergency in North Dakota declared by Governor Doug Burgum on March 13, 2020, in response to the public health crisis resulting from the SARS-CoV-2 pandemic, commonly known as COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution terminating the state of emergency in North Dakota declared by Governor Doug Burgum on March 13, 2020, in response to the public health crisis resulting from the SARS-CoV-2 pandemic, commonly known as COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 28 nays 65
2021-02-04HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2021-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback