ND SB2321 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 5-01-14 and 5-01-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to microbrew pubs and brewer taprooms.
Title
Microbrew pubs and brewer taprooms.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Larsen [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] |
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/14 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |