ND SB2315 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-58-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tribal-state gaming compacts.
Title
Tribal-state gaming compacts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |