ND SB2297 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial dog breeders; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Commercial dog breeders; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] |
Rep. Mary Johnson [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 31 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |