ND SB2278 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school district and employee immunity regarding COVID-19; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Title
School district and employee immunity regarding COVID-19; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Randy Lemm [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Rep. Donald Longmuir [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 15, Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2 |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | Request return from committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Transportation Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |