ND SB2253 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-39.2-26.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the allocation of funds in the state aid distribution fund; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The allocation of funds in the state aid distribution fund; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26 | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by Governor 04/26 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-15 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-13 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Conference committee appointed Pietsch Heilman S. Meyer | |
2011-04-06 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-05 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 3 | |
2011-04-04 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried | |
2011-02-11 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-28 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |