ND SB2239 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 36-01-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to animal identification program records; to amend and reenact section 36-01-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the development and maintenance of animal tracking databases; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The development and maintenance of animal tracking databases; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Arne Osland [R] | Rep. Jay Fisher [R] |
Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-29 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |