ND SB2233 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-29-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the offender education program.
Title
The offender education program.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Arne Osland [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] |
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |