ND 2227 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-16-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the members of the emergency commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The members of the emergency commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
2021-02-05SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback