ND SB2221 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 44-04-18.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exempting records of communications between legislators and public employees from open records laws.
Title
Exempting records of communications between legislators and public employees from open records laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] |
Rep. Mike Schatz [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 10 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2019-04-09 | House | Conference committee appointed Steiner Rohr Laning |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Conference committee appointed K. Roers Meyer Oban |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 5 |
2019-03-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2019-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 17 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |