ND SB2220 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 5-01-17, subsection 2 of section 5-01-19, and section 5-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the dispensing and selling of alcoholic beverages on Sunday; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The dispensing and selling of alcoholic beverages on Sunday; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] |
Rep. Michael Howe [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 49 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 49 nays 41 |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 4 2 |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 24 nays 22 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 26 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |