ND SB2214 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 51-30-01 and section 51-30-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to security breach notification.
Title
Security breach notification.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] |
Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] | Rep. Peter Silbernagel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Concurred |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2015-04-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:40 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |