ND SB2194 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-09-58, subsection? 1 of section 15.1-09.1-10, and sections 15.1-27-03.1, 15.1-27-15.1, 15.1-27-35, and 15.1-35-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the provision of and payment for early childhood education programs.
Title
The provision of and payment for early childhood education programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] |
Rep. Richard Holman [D] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 35 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 1 1 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |