ND 2190 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to repeal section 11-14-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reports to township clerks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reports to township clerks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08SenateSigned by Governor 03/08
2019-03-06SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-06SenateSigned by President
2019-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-05SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-04HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 1
2019-03-01HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2019-02-28HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-01-22HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-01-18SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback