ND 2174 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and a new section to chapter 54-61 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks by the commission on legal counsel for indigents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal history record checks by the commission on legal counsel for indigents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
2021-01-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback