ND SB2173 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 26.1-26-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance fees for annuities.
Title
Insurance fees for annuities.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Sen. Dale Patten [R] | Sen. Mark Weber [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Greg Stemen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |