ND SB2168 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 48-01.2-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public improvements.
Title
Public improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Rep. Richard Becker [R] |
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |