ND 2143 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 57-15-56 and section 57-39.2-26.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to matching grants to counties for senior citizen services and programs; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Matching grants to counties for senior citizen services and programs; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28SenateSigned by Governor 04/28
2015-04-28SenateSent to Governor
2015-04-28SenateSigned by President
2015-04-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-04-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 8
2015-04-27HouseConference committee report adopted
2015-04-27HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2015-04-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2015-04-22SenateConference committee report adopted
2015-04-22SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2015-04-01HouseConference committee appointed Dockter Trottier Mitskog
2015-03-31SenateConference committee appointed Oehlke Bekkedahl Triplett
2015-03-31SenateRefused to concur
2015-03-16SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2015-03-13HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 69 nays 22
2015-03-12HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-03-11HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2015-03-04HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2015-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2015-01-27HouseReceived from Senate
2015-01-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2015-01-23SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-01-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2015-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/bill-actions/ba2143.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0456-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0456-01001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0456-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0456-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0456-02003a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0456-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-0456-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/sr-dailyjnl-15.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/hr-dailyjnl-46.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/sr-dailyjnl-73.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/hr-dailyjnl-76.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback