ND 2143 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 14-02.4-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the administrative adjudication of discriminatory practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 14-02.4-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the administrative adjudication of discriminatory practices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-09 Filed with Secretary of State
2009-04-08 Signed by Governor
2009-04-07 Sent to Governor
2009-03-03 Signed by President
2009-03-03 Signed by Speaker
2009-03-02 Returned to Senate
2009-02-27 Second reading, passed, yeas 086 nays 000
2009-02-26 Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000
2009-02-26 Committee Hearing 09:30
2009-02-13 Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions
2009-01-14 Received from Senate
2009-01-12 Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000
2009-01-09 Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000
2009-01-09 Committee Hearing 09:30
2009-01-06 Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback