ND SB2142 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 16.1-07-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to processing absentee ballots.
Title
Processing absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 9 |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 1 |
2021-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |