ND SB2123 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 38-08-04.4, 38-08-04.5, 38-08-04.8, and 38-08-04.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authorization to enter contracts, abandoned oil and gas well plugging and site reclamation fund, and confiscation of equipment and recovery for costs of plugging and reclamation of sites with bonds held by the North Dakota industrial commission.
Title
The authorization to enter contracts, abandoned oil and gas well plugging and site reclamation fund, and confiscation of equipment and recovery for costs of plugging and reclamation of sites with bonds held by the North Dakota industrial commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/06 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |