ND SB2017 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the game and fish department; to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a gubernatorial proclamation concerning the hunting of elk; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
A gubernatorial proclamation concerning the hunting of elk; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/27 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-22 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 4 |
2015-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Conference committee appointed Brandenburg Thoreson Glassheim |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Sorvaag to replace Sen. Carlisle on conference committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wanzek Carlisle O'Connell |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 7 |
2015-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 22 1 0 |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |