ND SB2015 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the various divisions under the supervision of the director of the office of management and budget, the superintendent of public instruction, the state board of higher education, and the department of human services; to create and enact a new section to chapter 48-01.2, a new subdivision to subsection 1 of section 54-10-14, and a new section to chapter 54-27 of the North Dakota Century Code and a new section to House Bill No. 1185, a new section to Senate Bill No. 2083, and a new subdivision to subsection 6 of section 1 of House Bill No. 1438, as approved by the sixty-second legislative assembly, relating to public improvement bids and contracts, entities required to be audited by the state auditor, a report on federal grants, an emergency declaration, and an employer's prohibition on firearm possession; to amend and reenact section 39-02-03, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 54-03-20, and sections 54-16-03.1 and 54-35-02.3 of the North Dakota Century Code and sections 1 and 8 of House Bill No. 1014 and sections 1 and 8 of House Bill No. 1020, as approved by the sixty-second legislative assembly, relating to the powers and duties of the director of the department of transportation, housing reimbursement for members of the legislative assembly, petitions to the emergency commission, legislative management employee benefits programs committee, appropriations for the industrial commission, and appropriations to the branch research centers; to provide an exemption; to provide for various transfers; to provide legislative intent; to provide for legislative management reports; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The powers and duties of the director of the department of transportation, housing reimbursement for members of the legislative assembly, petitions to the emergency commission, legislative management employee benefits programs committee, appropriations for the industrial commission, and appropriations to the branch research centers; to provide an exemption; to provide for various transfers; to provide legislative intent; to provide for legislative management reports; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/18 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/18 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-28 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Conference committee appointed Carlson Delzer Glassheim | |
2011-04-18 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 3 1 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |