ND SB2014 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the industrial commission and the agencies under its control; to create and enact subsections 7 and 8 of section 54-17-07.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to housing finance agency programs; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 6-09-49, as amended by section 1 of House Bill No. 1431, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, section 6-09-49, the new section to chapter 6-09, as created by section 2 of House Bill No. 1431, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, section 6-09.4-05.1, section 6-09.4-06, as amended by section 3 of House Bill No. 1431, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, section 15-11-40, subsection 6 of section 17-05-08, subsection 1 of section 38-22-14, subsection 1 of section 38-22-15, and sections 54-17-40 and 57-51.1-07.9 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 7 of House Bill No. 1431, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, relating to the infrastructure revolving loan fund, the water infrastructure revolving loan fund, the state energy research center, transmission authority projects, public finance authority bonding, carbon dioxide storage fees, the housing incentive fund, and a bond issue limitation; to repeal section 54-17-07.12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the housing finance agency participating as a wholesale servicing mortgage lender; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a study; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The housing finance agency participating as a wholesale servicing mortgage lender; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a study; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 17 |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Appoint Rep. Vigesaa to replace Rep. Brandenburg on conference committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Howe Brandenburg Mock |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Sorvaag Hogue Mathern |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 10 |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 1 0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |