ND SB2008 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the public service commission; to provide for a railroad safety pilot program; to provide for a railroad training program; to amend and reenact sections 49-01-05 and 57-43.2-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of public service commissioners and the special fuels excise taxes distribution of funds; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to authorize a transfer; to provide an effective date; to provide for retroactive application; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The salary of public service commissioners and the special fuels excise taxes distribution of funds; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to authorize a transfer; to provide an effective date; to provide for retroactive application; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-27 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 4 |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Sorvaag to replace Sen. Wanzek on conference committee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Appoint Sen. G. Lee to replace Sen. Carlisle on conference committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Streyle Monson Guggisberg |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Carlisle Wanzek O'Connell |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-14 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-14 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 18 |
2015-04-14 | House | Majority report adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Divided committee report, amended, maj 17 min 4 |
2015-04-13 | House | Divided committee report, do pass, maj 17 min 4 |
2015-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |