ND SB2007 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the labor commissioner.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the labor commissioner.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/05 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-06 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-04 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 | |
2011-03-29 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-02-10 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-01-07 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |