ND 1537 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 12.1-31.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the seizure of a firearm by a law enforcement officer and the issuance of a public safety protection order; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The seizure of a firearm by a law enforcement officer and the issuance of a public safety protection order; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-14HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback