ND 1471 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-21.3-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state building code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The state building code.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-08 Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 40
2011-03-07 Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0
2011-02-08 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-02-03 Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2011-01-31 Received from House
2011-01-28 Second reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 20
2011-01-25 Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0
2011-01-24 Committee Hearing 02:00
2011-01-17 Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback