ND HB1463 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 43-30-16 and a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to application and renewal fees for armed first responder course instructor certification and possession of a concealed firearm or dangerous weapon; and to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 62.1-02-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing of instructors of armed first responders in schools.
Title
Licensing of instructors of armed first responders in schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Michael Howe [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 6 |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |