ND 1440 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 47-16-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rents and the priority of payments under a rental agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rents and the priority of payments under a rental agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 20 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 74
2021-02-08HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback