ND 1420 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a North Dakota film production tax credit; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A North Dakota film production tax credit; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61
2015-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-16HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0
2015-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2015-01-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback