ND HB1393 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 61-16.1-17, 61-16.1-21, 61-16.1-22, and 61-21-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to assessments by water resource districts.
Title
Assessments by water resource districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 79 |
2017-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 4 3 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |