ND 1381 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 40-23-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notice requirements; to amend and reenact sections 40-22-10 and 40-23.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notice requirements and the engineer's report for special improvement districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice requirements and the engineer's report for special improvement districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2021-03-18HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-16SenateSigned by President
2021-03-15HouseReturned to House
2021-03-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-11SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-02SenateReceived from House
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2021-01-26HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback