ND HB1370 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Bowman, Wardner A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 38-18.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to perfecting title to dormant minerals; and to amend and reenact sections 38-18.1-03, 38-18.1-04, 38-18.1-05, and 38-18.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to termination of mineral interests.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Bowman, Wardner A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 38-18.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to perfecting title to dormant minerals; and to amend and reenact sections 38-18.1-03, 38-18.1-04, 38-18.1-05, and 38-18.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to termination of mineral interests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-16 | Concurred | |
2009-04-07 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-06 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 002 | |
2009-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-20 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources | |
2009-02-16 | Received from House | |
2009-02-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 001 | |
2009-01-30 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1370.html |