ND HB1369 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 14-02.4-02, subsection 5 of section 14-02.5-01, subsection 4 of section 34-01-20, sections 34-05-01.1 and 34-05-01.2, subsection 8 of section 34-05-01.3, sections 34-07-05, 34-11.1-04, 34-14-11, 34-14-12, and 34-14-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a name change from the department of labor to the department of labor and human rights.
Title
A name change from the department of labor to the department of labor and human rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Rep. Ron Guggisberg [D] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] |
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2013-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 22 |
2013-02-11 | House | Request return from committee |
2013-02-08 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |