ND HB1332 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 23-09.3-01.1 and subsection 1 of section 23-16-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the moratorium on basic care and nursing facility bed capacity.
Title
The moratorium on basic care and nursing facility bed capacity.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2021-03-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-12 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 15 |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |